There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Special Registration for Telemedicine Clarification Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

Special Registration for Telemedicine Clarification Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To impose a deadline for the promulgation of interim final regulations in accordance with section 311(h) of the Controlled Substances Act (21 U.S.C. 831(h)) specifying the circumstances in which a special registration may be issued to a practitioner to engage in the practice of telemedicine, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
06/12/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H5060)
04/12/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
06/13/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
06/12/2018-5:09pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/12/2018-5:09pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5060)
06/12/2018-5:01pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5483.
06/12/2018-5:01pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5060-5061)
06/12/2018-5:00pmHouseMr. Walden moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
05/09/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
05/09/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
04/25/2018HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
04/25/2018HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
04/25/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
04/24/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
04/12/2018HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
04/12/2018HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
04/12/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce04/12/2018 Referred to
05/09/2018 Markup by
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health04/25/2018 Referred to
04/25/2018 Markup by
04/25/2018 Reported by
House Judiciary04/12/2018 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations04/24/2018 Referred to
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions06/13/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.5483. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (06/12/2018)

Special Registration for Telemedicine Clarification Act of 2018

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Controlled Substances Act to establish a deadline for the Drug Enforcement Administration to promulgate regulations for the special registration of practitioners to practice telemedicine.