There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Opioid Emergency Response Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for a comprehensive, multifaceted approach to preventing and treating opioid addiction.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
04/17/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date All Actions
05/22/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
04/24/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
04/17/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
04/17/2018Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, the Budget, Veterans' Affairs, Oversight and Government Reform, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/17/2018Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, the Budget, Veterans' Affairs, Oversight and Government Reform, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/17/2018Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, the Budget, Veterans' Affairs, Oversight and Government Reform, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/17/2018Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, the Budget, Veterans' Affairs, Oversight and Government Reform, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/17/2018Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, the Budget, Veterans' Affairs, Oversight and Government Reform, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/17/2018Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, the Budget, Veterans' Affairs, Oversight and Government Reform, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/17/2018Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7]* 04/17/2018
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 04/27/2018
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 05/10/2018

Committees (6)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce04/17/2018 Referred to
House Ways and Means04/17/2018 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health04/24/2018 Referred to
House Budget04/17/2018 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs04/17/2018 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health04/17/2018 Referred to
House Oversight and Government Reform04/17/2018 Referred to
House Judiciary04/17/2018 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations05/22/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5531. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/17/2018)

Opioid Emergency Response Act

This bill establishes a series of programs and requirements relating to opioid use, including programs to incentivize the use of opioid alternatives; the bill also creates a new, sixth schedule of controlled substances that includes specified synthetic fentanyl-related substances.