There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Special Counsel Transparency Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require a report of any Special Counsel who is removed from office, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/17/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
04/17/2018Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/17/2018Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (113)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 04/17/2018
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 04/17/2018
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 04/17/2018
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 04/17/2018
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 04/17/2018
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 04/17/2018
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 04/17/2018
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 04/17/2018
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/17/2018
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 04/17/2018
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/17/2018
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 05/17/2018
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/17/2018
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 05/17/2018
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/17/2018
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/17/2018
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 05/17/2018
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 05/17/2018
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 05/17/2018
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 05/17/2018
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 05/17/2018
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/17/2018
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/17/2018
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 05/17/2018
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 05/17/2018
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 05/24/2018
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/24/2018
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 05/24/2018
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 05/24/2018
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 05/24/2018
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 05/24/2018
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/05/2018
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 06/05/2018
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 06/05/2018
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/05/2018
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/05/2018
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 06/05/2018
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/15/2018
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 06/15/2018
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/15/2018
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 06/15/2018
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/15/2018
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/15/2018
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/15/2018
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 06/15/2018
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 06/15/2018
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/15/2018
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 06/15/2018
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 06/15/2018
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34] 06/15/2018
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 06/15/2018
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 06/15/2018
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 07/11/2018
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 07/11/2018
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 07/11/2018
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35] 07/11/2018
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/11/2018
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 07/11/2018
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 07/11/2018
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12] 07/19/2018
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 07/19/2018
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 07/19/2018
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/19/2018
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 07/19/2018
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 07/19/2018
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 07/19/2018
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/19/2018
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 07/19/2018
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 08/24/2018
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 08/24/2018
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 08/24/2018
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 08/24/2018
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 08/24/2018
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 08/24/2018
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 08/24/2018
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 08/24/2018
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 08/24/2018
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 09/04/2018
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/04/2018
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 09/04/2018
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4] 09/04/2018
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/25/2018
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 09/25/2018
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 09/25/2018
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 09/25/2018
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 09/25/2018
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/25/2018
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 09/26/2018
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13] 09/27/2018
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 09/27/2018
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 09/27/2018
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/27/2018
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 09/27/2018
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 09/27/2018
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 09/27/2018
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/27/2018
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 09/27/2018
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 09/27/2018
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/27/2018
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 09/27/2018
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 09/27/2018
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10] 09/27/2018
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2] 09/27/2018
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 09/27/2018
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/27/2018
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 09/27/2018
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/27/2018
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 09/28/2018
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 09/28/2018
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 09/28/2018
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 09/28/2018
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 11/30/2018
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 11/30/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary04/17/2018 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.5533.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5533. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/17/2018)

Special Counsel Transparency Act of 2018

This bill establishes reporting requirements with respect to a special counsel appointed under Department of Justice (DOJ) regulations.

Specifically, it establishes these requirements:

  • a special counsel must report periodically on the status of an investigation;
  • a special counsel who is removed from office must report on the status of an investigation, as of the date of dismissal; and
  • DOJ must report on the status of an investigation following the removal of a special counsel.