There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to provide for the inclusion of certain additional periods of active duty service for purposes of suspending charges to veterans' entitlement to educational assistance under the laws administered by the Secretary of Veterans Affairs during periods of suspended participation in vocational rehabilitation programs.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
07/24/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7133-7134)
07/24/2018Reported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-870.
04/17/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber
07/25/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
07/24/2018-6:36pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/24/2018-6:36pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7133-7134)
07/24/2018-6:28pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5538.
07/24/2018-6:28pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7133-7134)
07/24/2018-6:28pmHouseMr. Roe (TN) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
07/24/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 673.
07/24/2018HouseReported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-870.
07/12/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
07/12/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
05/23/2018HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity
04/17/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
04/17/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
04/17/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs04/17/2018 Referred to
07/12/2018 Markup by
07/24/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-870
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity04/17/2018 Referred to
05/23/2018 Hearings by
Senate Veterans' Affairs07/25/2018 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.5538.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.5538. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (07/24/2018)

(Sec. 1) This bill provides that veterans participating in a Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) vocational rehabilitation program who are unable to complete the program because they are called to active reserve duty for a preplanned training operation in support of a combat command or in response to a natural disaster or emergency shall not have the period of the program for which they did not get credit count toward their VA assistance limit.