There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Comprehensive Addiction Resources Emergency Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide emergency assistance to States, territories, Tribal nations, and local areas affected by the opioid epidemic and to make financial assistance available to States, territories, Tribal nations, local areas, and public or private nonprofit entities to provide for the development, organization, coordination, and operation of more effective and cost efficient systems for the delivery of essential services to individuals with substance use disorder and their families.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
04/18/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date All Actions
05/22/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
04/26/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
04/18/2018Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/18/2018Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/18/2018Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/18/2018Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (81)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 06/15/2018
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/15/2018
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 06/15/2018
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 06/15/2018
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/15/2018
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 06/15/2018
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/15/2018
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/15/2018
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 06/15/2018
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/15/2018
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 06/15/2018
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 06/15/2018
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 06/15/2018
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/15/2018
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34] 06/15/2018
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 06/15/2018
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/15/2018
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/15/2018
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 06/15/2018
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 06/15/2018
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 06/15/2018
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 06/15/2018
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 06/15/2018
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 06/15/2018
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/15/2018
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/15/2018
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 06/15/2018
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 06/15/2018
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 06/15/2018
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 06/15/2018
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/15/2018
Rep. Plaskett, Stacey E. [D-VI-At Large] 06/15/2018
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 06/15/2018
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/15/2018
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/15/2018
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 06/15/2018
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 06/15/2018
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/15/2018
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 06/15/2018
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 06/15/2018
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/15/2018
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 06/15/2018
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 06/15/2018
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 06/22/2018
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 06/22/2018
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 06/22/2018
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/22/2018
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 06/22/2018
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 06/22/2018
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 06/22/2018
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 06/25/2018
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 06/25/2018
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 06/25/2018
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 06/25/2018
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-12] 06/25/2018
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 06/25/2018
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 06/25/2018
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 06/25/2018
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 06/25/2018
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 06/25/2018
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/25/2018
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 06/25/2018
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 06/29/2018
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 06/29/2018
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 06/29/2018
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10] 06/29/2018
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 06/29/2018
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 06/29/2018
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 07/23/2018
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 07/23/2018
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 07/23/2018
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/23/2018
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/23/2018
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 07/23/2018
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 07/23/2018
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 07/23/2018
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 07/23/2018
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13] 07/26/2018
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/26/2018
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 09/28/2018
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 09/28/2018

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce04/18/2018 Referred to
House Judiciary04/18/2018 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations05/22/2018 Referred to
House Natural Resources04/18/2018 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs04/26/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5545. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/18/2018)

Comprehensive Addiction Resources Emergency Act of 2018

This bill establishes a series of grant programs to assist localities with addressing the opioid epidemic, such as through prevention and treatment services, training centers, and research activities.