There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Abuse Deterrent Access Act of 2018

Short Titles as Reported to House

Abuse Deterrent Access Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

Abuse Deterrent Access Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of Health and Human Services to conduct a study and submit a report on barriers to accessing abuse-deterrent opioid formulations for individuals enrolled in a plan under part C or D of the Medicare program.


Actions Overview (4)

Date Actions Overview
06/12/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H5061)
06/08/2018Committee on Ways and Means discharged.
06/08/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 115-721, Part I.
04/23/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber All Actions
06/13/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
06/12/2018-5:16pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/12/2018-5:16pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5061)
06/12/2018-5:10pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5582.
06/12/2018-5:10pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5061-5063)
06/12/2018-5:09pmHouseMr. Walden moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
06/08/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 556.
06/08/2018HouseCommittee on Ways and Means discharged.
06/08/2018HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 115-721, Part I.
05/09/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
05/09/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
05/01/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
04/23/2018HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
04/23/2018HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
04/23/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 04/23/2018
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23]* 04/23/2018
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/24/2018
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/11/2018
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/11/2018
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 05/11/2018

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Energy and Commerce04/23/2018 Referred to
05/09/2018 Markup by
06/08/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-721
House Ways and Means04/23/2018 Referred to
06/08/2018 Discharged from
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health05/01/2018 Referred to
Senate Finance06/13/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.5582. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (06/12/2018)

Abuse Deterrent Access Act of 2018

(Sec. 2) This bill requires the Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services to report to Congress on the adequacy of access to abuse-deterrent opioid formulations for individuals with chronic pain enrolled in a prescription drug plan under Medicare or Medicare Advantage (MA). The report must account for any barriers preventing enrollees from accessing such formulations under Medicare or MA.