There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to seek to enter into an agreement with the city of Vallejo, California, for the transfer of Mare Island Naval Cemetery in Vallejo, California, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/23/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
04/23/2018Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/23/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
04/23/2018Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (82)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12]* 04/23/2018
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 05/21/2018
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 05/21/2018
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 05/21/2018
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 05/22/2018
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 05/22/2018
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 06/05/2018
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 06/05/2018
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5] 06/06/2018
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 06/07/2018
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 06/07/2018
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 06/12/2018
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 06/12/2018
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 06/12/2018
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 06/12/2018
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/12/2018
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 06/12/2018
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 06/12/2018
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1] 06/12/2018
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 06/12/2018
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 06/12/2018
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 06/12/2018
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 06/12/2018
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 06/12/2018
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/12/2018
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 06/12/2018
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 06/12/2018
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 06/12/2018
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/12/2018
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 06/12/2018
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 06/12/2018
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/12/2018
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 06/12/2018
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 06/12/2018
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 06/12/2018
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 06/12/2018
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 06/13/2018
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 06/13/2018
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 06/13/2018
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 06/13/2018
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 06/13/2018
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 06/13/2018
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 06/13/2018
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 06/14/2018
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 06/14/2018
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 06/14/2018
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 06/14/2018
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 06/14/2018
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 06/14/2018
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/14/2018
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46] 06/14/2018
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 06/19/2018
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/19/2018
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 06/21/2018
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/21/2018
Rep. Lamb, Conor [D-PA-18] 06/21/2018
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 06/21/2018
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 06/21/2018
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 06/21/2018
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 06/25/2018
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 06/25/2018
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 06/25/2018
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/25/2018
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 06/25/2018
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 06/26/2018
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 06/26/2018
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/03/2018
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 07/03/2018
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 07/03/2018
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 07/11/2018
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 07/23/2018
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 08/17/2018
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 09/04/2018
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 09/27/2018
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 09/27/2018
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 09/27/2018
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 09/27/2018
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 09/27/2018
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 09/27/2018
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 09/27/2018
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35] 09/27/2018
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34] 09/27/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs04/23/2018 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs04/23/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5588. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/23/2018)

This bill directs the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to enter into an agreement with the city of Vallejo, California, for the transfer to the VA of Mare Island Naval Cemetery in Vallejo, California, to be maintained as a national shrine.