There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Water Affordability, Transparency, Equity, and Reliability Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish a trust fund to provide for adequate funding for water and sewer infrastructure, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/25/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date
05/22/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
04/26/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
04/25/2018Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Ways and Means, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/25/2018Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Ways and Means, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/25/2018Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Ways and Means, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/25/2018Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Ways and Means, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/25/2018Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (53)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 04/25/2018
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17]* 04/25/2018
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7]* 04/25/2018
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 04/25/2018
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 04/25/2018
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/25/2018
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 04/25/2018
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 04/25/2018
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4]* 04/25/2018
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17]* 04/25/2018
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 04/25/2018
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14]* 04/25/2018
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44]* 04/25/2018
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 04/25/2018
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 04/25/2018
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2]* 04/25/2018
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 04/25/2018
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/25/2018
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5]* 04/25/2018
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 04/25/2018
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24]* 04/25/2018
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 04/25/2018
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 04/25/2018
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 04/25/2018
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 04/25/2018
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 04/25/2018
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 04/25/2018
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 04/25/2018
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 04/25/2018
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 04/25/2018
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 04/25/2018
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11]* 04/25/2018
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 04/25/2018
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 04/25/2018
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 04/25/2018
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 04/25/2018
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 05/23/2018
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 06/01/2018
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 06/06/2018
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 06/15/2018
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/23/2018
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 07/23/2018
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 07/24/2018
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/24/2018
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 07/24/2018
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/26/2018
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 07/27/2018
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/31/2018
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 09/25/2018
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13] 09/25/2018
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 09/25/2018
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 10/19/2018
Rep. Jones, Brenda [D-MI-13] 12/06/2018

Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure04/25/2018 Referred to
House Transportation Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment04/26/2018 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce04/25/2018 Referred to
House Ways and Means04/25/2018 Referred to
House Agriculture04/25/2018 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit05/22/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5609. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/25/2018)

Water Affordability, Transparency, Equity, and Reliability Act of 2018

This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to: (1) establish a Water Affordability, Transparency, Equity, and Reliability Trust Fund; and (2) increase the corporate income tax rate to 24.5% to provide revenues for programs created by this bill.

The Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) and the Department of Agriculture must allocate funds from the trust fund to clean water programs, drinking water programs, and water well systems.

The bill amends Federal Water Pollution Control Act (commonly known as the Clean Water Act) to authorize the EPA to make grants for providing technical assistance for water and sanitation infrastructure and drinking water systems to rural and small municipalities and tribal governments. The EPA must establish a grant program for repairing, replacing, or upgrading septic tanks and drainage fields.

The bill amends the Consolidated Farm and Rural Development Act to make permanent a grant program for household water well systems in rural areas.

The bill revises requirements concerning the clean water state revolving fund (SRF) and the drinking water SRF.

The bill amends the Safe Drinking Water Act to require the EPA to make grants to local educational agencies for: (1) infrastructure to ensure that drinking water in schools is lead free, and (2) testing drinking water in schools for lead.