There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Quindaro Townsite National Commemorative Site Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Quindaro Townsite National Commemorative Site Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Quindaro Townsite National Historic Landmark Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To designate the Quindaro Townsite in Kansas City, Kansas, as a National Commemorative Site.

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the Quindaro Townsite in Kansas City, Kansas, as a National Historic Landmark, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
07/23/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6630)
07/23/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-856.
04/25/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/12/2018SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks
07/24/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
07/23/2018-5:55pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
07/23/2018-5:55pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/23/2018-5:55pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6630)
07/23/2018-5:45pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5613.
07/23/2018-5:45pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6630-6631)
07/23/2018-5:45pmHouseMr. McClintock moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
07/23/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 663.
07/23/2018HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-856.
07/11/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
07/11/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
07/11/2018HouseSubcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged.
06/21/2018HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands
05/02/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
04/25/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
04/25/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 04/25/2018
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/07/2018
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1] 05/11/2018
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 05/22/2018
Rep. Estes, Ron [R-KS-4] 06/07/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources04/25/2018 Referred to
07/11/2018 Markup by
07/23/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-856
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands05/02/2018 Referred to
06/21/2018 Hearings by
07/11/2018 Discharged from
Senate Energy and Natural Resources07/24/2018 Referred to
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks12/12/2018 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5613. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/25/2018)

Quindaro Townsite National Historic Landmark Act

This bill designates the Quindaro Townsite in Kansas City, Kansas, which is associated with the the Bleeding Kansas conflict of 1854-1861 and the Underground Railroad, as the Quindaro Townsite National Historic Landmark.