There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Flatside Wilderness Enhancement Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Flatside Wilderness Enhancement Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Flatside Wilderness Enhancement Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Flatside Wilderness Enhancement Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Flatside Wilderness Enhancement Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate additions to the Flatside Wilderness on the Ouachita National Forest, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
01/10/2019Became Public Law No: 115-430.
01/10/2019Signed by President.
01/02/2019Presented to President.
12/22/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.(text: CR S8025)
12/22/2018Senate Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S8025)
11/13/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H9479)
10/23/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-989.
04/26/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (20)

Date Chamber
01/10/2019Became Public Law No: 115-430.
01/10/2019Signed by President.
01/02/2019HousePresented to President.
12/22/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/22/2018SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (text: CR S8025)
12/22/2018SenateSenate Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8025)
11/14/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
11/13/2018-4:19pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/13/2018-4:19pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9479)
11/13/2018-4:14pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5636.
11/13/2018-4:14pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9478-9479)
11/13/2018-4:14pmHouseMr. Lamborn moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
10/23/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 772.
10/23/2018HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-989.
09/26/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
09/26/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
09/26/2018HouseSubcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged.
05/08/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
04/26/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
04/26/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8]* 04/26/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources04/26/2018 Referred to
09/26/2018 Markup by
10/23/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-989
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands05/08/2018 Referred to
09/26/2018 Discharged from
Senate Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry11/14/2018 Referred to
12/22/2018 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.R.5636.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5636. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-430 (01/10/2019)

Flatside Wilderness Enhancement Act

(Sec. 2) The bill adds certain land in the Ouachita National Forest, comprising approximately 640 acres and identified as Recommended Wilderness Additions, to the Flatside Wilderness in the portion of the forest in Arkansas.

(Sec. 3) The bill designates the wilderness additions as the Bethune Woods-Flatside Wilderness.