There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Driftnet Modernization and Bycatch Reduction Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To improve the management of driftnet fishing.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
04/26/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
05/08/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
04/26/2018Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/26/2018Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-8] 06/01/2018
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 06/20/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Natural Resources04/26/2018 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans05/08/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5638. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/26/2018)

Driftnet Modernization and Bycatch Reduction Act

This bill addresses certain driftnet fishing. (Driftnet fishing is a method of fishing in which a gillnet composed of a panel or panels of webbing, or a series of such gillnets, is placed in the water and allowed to drift with the currents and winds for the purpose of entangling fish in the webbing.)

Currently, the use of large-scale drift gillnets with a total length of 2.5 kilometers or more is prohibited in the United States. The bill expands the definition of large-scale driftnet fishing to prohibit the use of gillnets with a mesh size of 14 inches or greater. This expanded prohibition does not apply within the U.S. exclusive economic zone prior to January 1, 2020.

The Department of Commerce must conduct a transition program to facilitate the phase out of large-scale driftnet fishing and to promote the adoption of alternative fishing practices that minimize the incidental catch of living marine resources.

Commerce may award grants to program participants.