There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Navy SEAL Chief Petty Officer William "Bill" Mulder (Ret.) Transition Improvement Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

Navy SEAL Chief Petty Officer William "Bill" Mulder (Ret.) Transition Improvement Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend titles 10 and 38, United States Code, to amend the Social Security Act, and to direct the Secretaries of Veterans Affairs, Defense, Labor, and Homeland Security, and the Administrator of the Small Business Administration, to take certain actions to improve transition assistance to members of the Armed Forces who separate, retire, or are discharged from the Armed Forces, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
07/24/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7135-7137)
07/24/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-864, Part I.
04/27/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber All Actions
07/25/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
07/24/2018-7:02pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/24/2018-7:02pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7135-7137)
07/24/2018-6:37pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5649.
07/24/2018-6:36pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7134-7140)
07/24/2018-6:36pmHouseMr. Roe (TN) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
07/24/2018HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-864, Part I.
07/12/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
07/12/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
05/23/2018HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity
05/10/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Human Resources.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
04/30/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
04/27/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
04/27/2018HouseReferred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committees on Veterans' Affairs, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
04/27/2018HouseReferred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committees on Veterans' Affairs, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
04/27/2018HouseReferred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committees on Veterans' Affairs, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
04/27/2018HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H3731-3732)
04/27/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (11)


Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Armed Services04/27/2018 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel04/30/2018 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs04/27/2018 Referred to
07/12/2018 Markup by
07/24/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-864
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity04/27/2018 Referred to
05/23/2018 Hearings by
House Ways and Means04/27/2018 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Human Resources05/10/2018 Referred to
Senate Veterans' Affairs07/25/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5649. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/27/2018)

Navy SEAL Chief Petty Officer William “Bill” Mulder (Ret.) Transition Improvement Act of 2018

This bill extends, expands, and modifies transition assistance and educational assistance for former members of the Armed Forces and their spouses.