There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Camp Nelson Heritage National Monument Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Camp Nelson Heritage National Monument Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Camp Nelson Heritage National Monument Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Camp Nelson National Monument Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish the Camp Nelson Heritage National Monument in the State of Kentucky as a unit of the National Park System, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (5)

Date
12/04/2018By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 115-406.
11/29/2018Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. Without written report.
06/05/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 376 - 4 (Roll no. 233).(text: CR H4753)
05/21/2018Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-695.
04/27/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (19)

Date Chamber
12/04/2018SenateBy Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 115-406.
11/29/2018SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 693.
11/29/2018SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. Without written report.
10/02/2018SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
08/15/2018SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks
06/06/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
06/05/2018-7:15pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/05/2018-7:14pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 376 - 4 (Roll no. 233). (text: CR H4753)
06/05/2018-7:06pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4760-4761)
06/05/2018-5:21pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
06/05/2018-5:12pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5655.
06/05/2018-5:12pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4753-4754)
06/05/2018-5:12pmHouseMr. Bishop (UT) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
05/21/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 538.
05/21/2018HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-695.
05/08/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
05/08/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
04/27/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
04/27/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources04/27/2018 Referred to
05/08/2018 Markup by
05/21/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-695
Senate Energy and Natural Resources06/06/2018 Referred to
10/02/2018 Markup by
11/29/2018 Reported by S. Rept. 115-406
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks08/15/2018 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5655. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/27/2018)

Camp Nelson Heritage National Monument Act

This bill establishes, as a unit of the National Park System, the Camp Nelson Heritage National Monument in Nicholasville, Kentucky, in order to preserve, protect, and interpret the nationally significant historic resources of Camp Nelson and its role in the Civil War, Reconstruction, and African-American history and civil rights.