There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Medicare Opioid Safety Education Act of 2018

Short Titles as Reported to House

Medicare Opioid Safety Education Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

Medicare Opioid Safety Education Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to provide educational resources regarding opioid use and pain management as part of the Medicare & You handbook.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
06/12/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H5064)
06/08/2018Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 115-715, Part I.
05/07/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber All Actions
06/13/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
06/12/2018-5:31pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/12/2018-5:31pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5064)
06/12/2018-5:24pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5685.
06/12/2018-5:24pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5064-5066)
06/12/2018-5:24pmHouseMr. Walden moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
06/08/2018HouseReported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 115-715, Part I.
05/11/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
05/09/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
05/09/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
05/07/2018HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
05/07/2018HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
05/07/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16]* 05/07/2018
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 05/07/2018
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 05/08/2018
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/09/2018
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/23/2018
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 06/01/2018

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means05/07/2018 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health05/11/2018 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce05/07/2018 Referred to
05/09/2018 Markup by
06/08/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-715
Senate Finance06/13/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.5685. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (06/12/2018)

Medicare Opioid Safety Education Act of 2018

(Sec. 2) This bill requires the Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services to provide Medicare beneficiaries with educational resources regarding opioid use and pain management, as well as descriptions of covered alternative (non-opioid) pain-management treatments.