There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Protect and Serve Act of 2018

Short Titles as Reported to House

Protect and Serve Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

Protect and Serve Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 18, United States Code, to punish criminal offenses targeting law enforcement officers, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
05/16/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 382 - 35 (Roll no. 188).
05/11/2018Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 115-672.
05/08/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (20)

Date Chamber
05/17/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
05/16/2018-6:36pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/16/2018-6:36pmHouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 382 - 35 (Roll no. 188).
05/16/2018-6:13pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4057)
05/16/2018-3:45pmHousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.R. 5698, the Chair put the question on passage of the bill and by voice vote announced the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Goodlatte demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings on passage of H.R. 5698 until later in the legislative day.
05/16/2018-3:44pmHouseH.Amdt.584 On agreeing to the Goodlatte amendment (A001) Agreed to by voice vote.
05/16/2018-3:44pmHouseH.Amdt.584 The previous question was ordered on the amendment and bill without objection.
05/16/2018-3:42pmHouseDEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 891, the House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Goodlatte amendment No. 1.
05/16/2018-3:42pmHouseH.Amdt.584 Amendment (A001) offered by Mr. Goodlatte. (consideration: CR H5014; text: CR H5014)
05/16/2018-3:13pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 5698.
05/16/2018-3:12pmHouseORDER OF BUSINESS - Mr. Goodlatte asked unanimous consent that the question of adopting the amendment H.R. 5698 may be subject to postponement as though under clause 8 of rule 20.
05/16/2018-3:12pmHouseThe resolution provides for 1 hour of general on all three bills. For H.R. 5698 and H.R. 2, the resolution provides for consideration under a structured rule. For S. 2372, the resolution provides for consideration under a closed rule. Finally, the resolution provides for one motion to recommit with or without instructions on all three bills.
05/16/2018-3:11pmHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 891. (consideration: CR H4009-40014; text of measure as reported in House: CR H4009)
05/15/2018-8:24pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 891 Reported to House. The resolution provides for 1 hour of general on all three bills. For H.R. 5698 and H.R. 2, the resolution provides for consideration under a structured rule. For S. 2372, the resolution provides for consideration under a closed rule. Finally, the resolution provides for one motion to recommit with or without instructions on all three bills.
05/11/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 517.
05/11/2018HouseReported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 115-672.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
05/09/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
05/09/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
05/08/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
05/08/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10]* 05/08/2018
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10] 05/09/2018
Rep. Dunn, Neal P. [R-FL-2] 05/10/2018
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-8] 05/10/2018
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 05/11/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary05/08/2018 Referred to
05/09/2018 Markup by
05/11/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-672
Senate Judiciary05/17/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.5698. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House without amendment (05/11/2018)

Protect and Serve Act of 2018

This bill amends the federal criminal code to add a new section that imposes criminal penalties on a person who knowingly causes (or attempts to cause) serious bodily injury to a law enforcement officer in certain circumstances that affect interstate commerce.