There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

PIRATE Act
Preventing Illegal Radio Abuse Through Enforcement Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

PIRATE Act
Preventing Illegal Radio Abuse Through Enforcement Act

Short Titles as Introduced

PIRATE Act
Preventing Illegal Radio Abuse Through Enforcement Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Communications Act of 1934 to provide for enhanced penalties for pirate radio, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
07/23/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
07/18/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 115-843.
05/08/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
07/24/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
07/23/2018-2:42pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/23/2018-2:42pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6597)
07/23/2018-2:33pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5709.
07/23/2018-2:33pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6597-6598)
07/23/2018-2:33pmHouseMr. Lance moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
07/18/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 652.
07/18/2018HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 115-843.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
07/12/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
07/12/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
06/13/2018HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Communications and Technology
06/13/2018HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Communications and Technology
05/11/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
05/08/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
05/08/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce05/08/2018 Referred to
07/12/2018 Markup by
07/18/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-843
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Communications and Technology05/11/2018 Referred to
06/13/2018 Markup by
06/13/2018 Reported by
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation07/24/2018 Referred to

As of 12/11/2018 no related bill information has been received for H.R.5709 - PIRATE Act.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5709. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/08/2018)

Preventing Illegal Radio Abuse Through Enforcement Act or the PIRATE Act

This bill amends the Communications Act of 1934 to address unlawful radio broadcasting (called "pirating"), including:

  • making the fine for a pirate radio broadcasting violation up to $100,000 per day (Currently, there is a general penalty of up to $10,000 for any wire and radio communications law violation.);
  • establishing a fine of up to $2,000,000 for any person who facilitates pirate radio broadcasting ("facilitating" includes providing access to property or providing physical goods or services); and
  • requiring the Federal Communications Commission to focus on the top five radio markets twice a year to eliminate pirate radio broadcasting.