There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

The Solitary Confinement Study and Reform Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To develop and implement national standards for the use of solitary confinement in correctional facilities, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/08/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
05/22/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
05/08/2018Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/08/2018Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (40)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/08/2018
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 05/08/2018
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 05/08/2018
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 05/08/2018
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 05/08/2018
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 05/08/2018
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 05/08/2018
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 05/08/2018
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/08/2018
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 05/08/2018
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 05/08/2018
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 05/08/2018
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 05/08/2018
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 05/08/2018
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 05/08/2018
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 05/08/2018
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7]* 05/08/2018
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 05/08/2018
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 05/08/2018
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 05/08/2018
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 05/08/2018
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 05/08/2018
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 05/08/2018
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 05/08/2018
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 05/08/2018
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 05/08/2018
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 05/08/2018
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 05/08/2018
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/08/2018
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 05/08/2018
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 05/08/2018
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 05/08/2018
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 05/08/2018
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 05/09/2018
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 05/09/2018
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 05/09/2018
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 05/10/2018
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/10/2018
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/16/2018
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 09/05/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary05/08/2018 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations05/22/2018 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.5710.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5710. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/08/2018)

The Solitary Confinement Study and Reform Act of 2018

This bill establishes the National Solitary Confinement Study and Reform Commission: (1) to study the impact of solitary confinement in correctional facilities on governments, communities, and social institutions; (2) to report findings; and (3) to recommend national standards to reduce the use of solitary confinement.

The bill directs the Department of Justice (DOJ) to publish national standards to reduce solitary confinement in correctional facilities.

The Bureau of Prisons must comply with the national standards immediately.

A state or local government must certify compliance with the national standards to be eligible for DOJ-administered grant program funding to construct, maintain, or operate correctional facilities.