There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Transportation Worker Identification Credential Accountability Act of 2018

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Transportation Worker Identification Credential Accountability Act of 2018

Short Titles as Reported to House

Transportation Worker Identification Credential Accountability Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

Transportation Worker Identification Credential Accountability Act of 2018

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Transportation Worker Identification Credential Accountability Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To restrict the department in which the Coast Guard is operating from implementing any rule requiring the use of biometric readers for biometric transportation security cards until after submission to Congress of the results of an assessment of the effectiveness of the transportation security card program.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
08/02/2018Became Public Law No: 115-230. (TXT | PDF)
08/02/2018Signed by President.
08/01/2018Presented to President.
07/26/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S5437)
07/10/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H5729)
06/27/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-790, Part I.
05/09/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber All Actions
08/02/2018Became Public Law No: 115-230. (TXT | PDF)
08/02/2018Signed by President.
08/01/2018HousePresented to President.
07/30/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/26/2018SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5437)
07/11/2018SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
07/10/2018-2:40pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/10/2018-2:40pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5729)
07/10/2018-2:31pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5729.
07/10/2018-2:31pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5996-5997)
07/10/2018-2:31pmHouseMr. Katko moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
06/27/2018HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-790, Part I.
06/06/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
06/06/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
05/10/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
05/09/2018HouseReferred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
05/09/2018HouseReferred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
05/09/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 05/09/2018
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/09/2018
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 05/09/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure05/09/2018 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation05/10/2018 Referred to
House Homeland Security05/09/2018 Referred to
06/06/2018 Markup by
06/27/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-790

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.5729. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-230 (08/02/2018)

Transportation Worker Identification Credential Accountability Act of 2018

(Sec. 2) This bill prohibits the U.S. Coast Guard from: (1) implementing the rule titled "Transportation Worker Identification Credential (TWIC)-Reader Requirements," and (2) proposing or issuing a notice of proposed rulemaking for a rule that would require the use of biometric readers for biometric transportation security cards.

These prohibitions end 60 days after the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) submits to Congress an assessment of the transportation security card program.

(Sec. 3) DHS must report to Congress on implementation of the transportation security card program within 30 days of the bill's enactment and every 90 days after that until it completes the assessment.