There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Charitable Giving Tax Deduction Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to allow the deduction for charitable contributions as an above-the-line deduction.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/10/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
05/10/2018Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/10/2018Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 05/10/2018
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/24/2018
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 06/01/2018
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 06/20/2018
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 07/11/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means05/10/2018 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.5771.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5771. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/10/2018)

Charitable Giving Tax Deduction Act

This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to allow a deduction from gross income (above-the-line deduction) for charitable contributions that are allowed as an itemized deduction under current law.