There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

PASS Act of 2018
Preventing Addiction for Susceptible Seniors Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

PASS Act of 2018
Preventing Addiction for Susceptible Seniors Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to require electronic prior authorization for covered part D drugs and to provide for other program integrity measures under parts C and D of the Medicare program.

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to require Medicare prescription drug plans to establish drug management programs for at-risk beneficiaries, require electronic prior authorization for covered part D drugs, and to provide for other program integrity measures under parts C and D of the Medicare program.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
06/19/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H5258-5259)
06/19/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 115-761, Part I.
05/11/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber
06/20/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
06/19/2018-4:21pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
06/19/2018-4:21pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/19/2018-4:21pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5258-5259)
06/19/2018-4:11pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5773.
06/19/2018-4:10pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5258-5261)
06/19/2018-4:10pmHouseMr. Roskam moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
06/19/2018HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 115-761, Part I.
06/04/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
05/16/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
05/16/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
05/11/2018HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
05/11/2018HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
05/11/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (7)


Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce05/11/2018 Referred to
House Ways and Means05/11/2018 Referred to
05/16/2018 Markup by
06/19/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-761
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health06/04/2018 Referred to
Senate Finance06/20/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.5773. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (06/19/2018)

Preventing Addiction for Susceptible Seniors Act of 2018 or the PASS Act of 2018

(Sec. 2) This bill alters several requirements under the Medicare prescription drug benefit. Specifically, the bill requires electronic prescription programs to enable the secure transmittal of prior authorization requests for covered drugs.

(Sec. 3) The bill also requires the Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services (CMS) to establish a secure online portal to allow: (1) data sharing among the CMS, Medicare prescription drug benefit plans, and Medicare Advantage (MA) plans; and (2) referrals by such plans of substantiated fraud, waste, or abuse in order to initiate or assist investigations by contracted entities under the Medicare Integrity Program.

(Sec. 4) The bill also establishes individuals who are identified as at-risk beneficiaries for prescription drug abuse as qualifying participants in medication therapy management programs under the Medicare prescription drug benefit.

(Sec. 5) The CMS must also: (1) identify outlier prescribers of opioids under Medicare prescription drug benefit plans and MA plans, based on specialty and geographic area; and (2) annually notify such prescribers of their status and provide them with resources on proper prescribing methods.