There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

PROPER Act of 2018
Providing Reliable Options for Patients and Educational Resources Act of 2018

Short Titles as Reported to House

PROPER Act of 2018
Providing Reliable Options for Patients and Educational Resources Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

PROPER Act of 2018
Providing Reliable Options for Patients and Educational Resources Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to require Medicare Advantage plans and part D prescription drug plans to include information on the risks associated with opioids, coverage of certain nonopioid treatments used to treat pain, and on the safe disposal of prescription drugs, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (4)

Date
06/19/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H5256-5257)
06/19/2018Committee on Energy and Commerce discharged.
06/19/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 115-763, Part I.
05/11/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
06/20/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
06/19/2018-4:10pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/19/2018-4:10pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5256-5257)
06/19/2018-4:01pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5775.
06/19/2018-4:01pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5256-5258)
06/19/2018-4:01pmHouseMr. Curbelo (FL) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
06/19/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 594.
06/19/2018HouseCommittee on Energy and Commerce discharged.
06/19/2018HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 115-763, Part I.
06/04/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
05/16/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
05/16/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
05/11/2018HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
05/11/2018HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
05/11/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Poliquin, Bruce [R-ME-2]* 05/11/2018
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 05/11/2018
Rep. Lamb, Conor [D-PA-18]* 05/11/2018
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-8] 05/21/2018
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/29/2018

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means05/11/2018 Referred to
05/16/2018 Markup by
06/19/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-763
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health06/04/2018 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce05/11/2018 Referred to
06/19/2018 Discharged from
Senate Finance06/20/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.5775. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (06/19/2018)

Providing Reliable Options for Patients and Educational Resources Act of 2018 or the PROPER Act of 2018

(Sec. 2) This bill requires Medicare and Medicare Advantage (MA) prescription drug plan (PDP) sponsors to annually disclose information to enrollees about: (1) the risks of prolonged opioid use; and (2) the plan's coverage of nonpharmacological therapies, devices, and non-opioid medications. PDP sponsors may limit disclosure to a subset of enrollees (such as those who were prescribed an opioid in the previous two-year period).

(Sec. 3) The bill also requires Medicare medication therapy management programs and MA in-home health risk assessments to include information about the safe disposal of prescription drugs.

(Sec. 4) The bill prohibits inclusion of pain management questions in certain health care system surveys, unless the questions address the risks of opioid use and the availability of non-opioid alternatives.