There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

KITTEN Act of 2018
Kittens In Traumatic Testing Ends Now Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of Agriculture to end the use of cats in experiments that cause pain or stress.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/11/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
06/22/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
05/11/2018Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/11/2018Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (61)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20]* 05/11/2018
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1] 05/17/2018
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 05/17/2018
Rep. Donovan, Daniel M., Jr. [R-NY-11] 05/17/2018
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/17/2018
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/17/2018
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 05/21/2018
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 05/21/2018
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34] 05/24/2018
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/24/2018
Rep. Mitchell, Paul [R-MI-10] 05/24/2018
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 06/06/2018
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/06/2018
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 06/06/2018
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 06/06/2018
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13] 06/06/2018
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 06/06/2018
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12] 06/06/2018
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/06/2018
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 06/07/2018
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 06/08/2018
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/08/2018
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 06/08/2018
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 06/08/2018
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 06/08/2018
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 06/13/2018
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 06/13/2018
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 06/13/2018
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/13/2018
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 06/13/2018
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 06/13/2018
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 06/21/2018
Rep. Trott, David A. [R-MI-11] 06/21/2018
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 06/22/2018
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 06/22/2018
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 07/16/2018
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 07/16/2018
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 07/16/2018
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 07/19/2018
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 07/24/2018
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 07/24/2018
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-8] 07/24/2018
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 07/24/2018
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/26/2018
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/06/2018
Rep. Lamb, Conor [D-PA-18] 09/06/2018
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18] 09/06/2018
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5] 09/06/2018
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 09/06/2018
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10] 09/13/2018
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/17/2018
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 09/25/2018
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/26/2018
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 09/26/2018
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 09/26/2018
Rep. Brat, Dave [R-VA-7] 09/28/2018
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 10/02/2018
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 10/19/2018
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 10/19/2018
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 10/26/2018
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 11/09/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Agriculture05/11/2018 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture06/22/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5780. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/11/2018)

Kittens In Traumatic Testing Ends Now Act of 2018 or the KITTEN Act of 2018

This bill amends the Animal Welfare Act to prohibit the Department of Agriculture from using cats in experiments that may cause pain or stress, unless the pain or stress is a result of a physical exam or training program.