There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Strengthening Coastal Communities Act of 2018

Short Titles as Reported to House

Strengthening Coastal Communities Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

Strengthening Coastal Communities Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Coastal Barrier Resources Act to give effect to more accurate maps of units of the John H. Chafee Coastal Barrier Resources System that were produced by digital mapping of such units, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
11/16/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 375 - 1 (Roll no. 419).
10/30/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-997.
05/15/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber
11/26/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
11/16/2018-10:50amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/16/2018-10:50amHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 375 - 1 (Roll no. 419). (text: CR 11/13/2018 H9477)
11/16/2018-10:18amHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H9550)
11/13/2018-4:13pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Lamborn objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was considered as withdrawn.
11/13/2018-4:04pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5787.
11/13/2018-4:04pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9476-9478)
11/13/2018-4:04pmHouseMr. Lamborn moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
10/30/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 779.
10/30/2018HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-997.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
06/13/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
06/13/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
05/15/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
05/15/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large]* 05/15/2018
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17]* 05/15/2018
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18] 09/04/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources05/15/2018 Referred to
06/13/2018 Markup by
10/30/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-997
Senate Environment and Public Works11/26/2018 Referred to

As of 12/09/2018 no related bill information has been received for H.R.5787 - Strengthening Coastal Communities Act of 2018.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.