There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

STOP Act of 2018
Synthetics Trafficking and Overdose Prevention Act of 2018

Short Titles as Reported to House

Securing the International Mail Against Opioids Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

Securing the International Mail Against Opioids Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for the processing by U.S. Customs and Border Protection of certain international mail shipments and to require the provision of advance electronic information on international mail shipments of mail, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (5)

Date
06/14/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 353 - 52 (Roll no. 265).(text: CR H5163-5166)
06/11/2018Committee on Oversight and Government discharged.
06/08/2018Committee on Homeland Security discharged.
06/08/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 115-722, Part I.
05/15/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (24)

Date Chamber
06/18/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
06/14/2018-4:28pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/14/2018-4:28pmHouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 353 - 52 (Roll no. 265). (text: CR H5163-5166)
06/14/2018-4:01pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5184)
06/14/2018-1:05pmHousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.R. 5788, the Chair put the question on passage, and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Bishop (MI) demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the question of passage until a time to be announced.
06/14/2018-1:05pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
06/14/2018-12:21pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 5788.
06/14/2018-12:20pmHouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 2851, H.R. 5735 and H.R. 5788 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. Specified amendments are in order.
06/14/2018-12:20pmHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 934. (consideration: CR H5163-5172)
06/13/2018-1:52pmHouseRule H. Res. 934 passed House.
06/12/2018-8:37pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 934 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2851, H.R. 5735 and H.R. 5788 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. Specified amendments are in order.
06/11/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 557.
06/11/2018HouseCommittee on Oversight and Government discharged.
06/08/2018HouseCommittee on Homeland Security discharged.
06/08/2018HouseHouse Committee on Oversight and Government Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than June 11, 2018.
06/08/2018HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 115-722, Part I.
05/31/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
05/31/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
05/16/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
05/16/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
05/15/2018HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Oversight and Government Reform, and Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
05/15/2018HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Oversight and Government Reform, and Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
05/15/2018HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Oversight and Government Reform, and Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
05/15/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 05/15/2018
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 05/15/2018
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 05/15/2018
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/08/2018
Rep. Hill, J. French [R-AR-2] 06/08/2018
Rep. Faso, John J. [R-NY-19] 06/08/2018

Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means05/15/2018 Referred to
05/16/2018 Markup by
06/08/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-722
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Trade05/31/2018 Referred to
House Oversight and Government Reform05/15/2018 Referred to
06/11/2018 Discharged from
House Homeland Security05/15/2018 Referred to
06/08/2018 Discharged from
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security05/31/2018 Referred to
Senate Finance06/18/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.