There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title XIX of the Social Security Act to provide for Medicaid coverage protections for pregnant and post-partum women while receiving inpatient treatment for a substance use disorder, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
06/12/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 115-730.
05/15/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
06/12/2018Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 565.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/12/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 115-730.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
05/17/2018Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
05/17/2018Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
05/15/2018Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/15/2018Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 05/15/2018
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/18/2018
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/24/2018
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 05/24/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce05/15/2018 Referred to
05/17/2018 Markup by
06/12/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-730

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.5789. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House with amendment(s) (06/12/2018)

This bill requires the Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services to develop guidance for states on neonatal abstinence syndrome services, including coverage options under Medicaid and the Children's Health Insurance Program (CHIP). The Government Accountability Office must also study Medicaid coverage gaps for pregnant and postpartum women with substance-use disorders.