There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

IMD CARE Act
Individuals in Medicaid Deserve Care that is Appropriate and Responsible in its Execution Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

IMD CARE Act
Individuals in Medicaid Deserve Care that is Appropriate and Responsible in its Execution Act

Short Titles as Introduced

IMD CARE Act
Individuals in Medicaid Deserve Care that is Appropriate and Responsible in its Delivery Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title XIX of the Social Security Act to allow States to provide under Medicaid services for certain individuals with opioid use disorders in institutions for mental diseases.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
06/20/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 261 - 155 (Roll no. 276).
06/12/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 115-723.
05/15/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (32)

Date Chamber All Actions
06/21/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
06/20/2018-4:22pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/20/2018-4:21pmHouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 261 - 155 (Roll no. 276).
06/20/2018-4:13pmHouseOn motion to recommit with instructions Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 190 - 226 (Roll no. 275).
06/20/2018-3:46pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5344-5345)
06/20/2018-2:42pmHousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on Castor (FL) motion to recommit with instructions, the Chair put the question on the motion, and by voice vote, announced that the noes had prevailed. Ms. Castor (FL) demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the motion to recommit with instructions until a time to be announced.
06/20/2018-2:33pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Castor motion to recommit with instructions pending a reservation of a point of order. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back to the House with an amendment to strike all that follows after section 1 and insert a section entitled Medicaid State Plan Option to Provide Services for Certain Individuals with Substance Use Disorders in Qualified Institutions for Mental Diseases. Subsequently, the reservation was removed.
06/20/2018-2:33pmHouseMs. Castor (FL) moved to recommit with instructions to the Committee on Energy and Commerce. (text: CR H5342-5343)
06/20/2018-2:32pmHouseThe House adopted the amendments en gross as agreed to by the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union.
06/20/2018-2:32pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
06/20/2018-2:31pmHouseThe House rose from the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union to report H.R. 5797.
06/20/2018-2:31pmHouseH.Amdt.795 By unanimous consent, the Fitzpatrick amendment was withdrawn. (consideration: CR H5342)
06/20/2018-2:26pmHouseDEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 949, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Fitzpatrick amendment No. 3.
06/20/2018-2:26pmHouseH.Amdt.795 Amendment (A003) offered by Mr. Fitzpatrick. (consideration: CR H5341-5342; text: CR H5341)
06/20/2018-2:25pmHouseH.Amdt.794 On agreeing to the Kildee amendment (A002) Agreed to by voice vote.
06/20/2018-2:20pmHouseDEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 949, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Kildee amendment No. 2.
06/20/2018-2:19pmHouseH.Amdt.794 Amendment (A002) offered by Mr. Kildee. (consideration: CR H5340-5341; text: CR H5341)
06/20/2018-2:19pmHouseH.Amdt.793 On agreeing to the Rush amendment (A001) Agreed to by voice vote.
06/20/2018-2:10pmHouseDEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 949, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Rush amendment No. 1.
06/20/2018-2:09pmHouseH.Amdt.793 Amendment (A001) offered by Mr. Rush. (consideration: CR H5339-5340; text: CR H5340)
06/20/2018-1:46pmHouseGENERAL DEBATE - The Committee of the Whole proceeded with one hour of general debate on H.R. 5797.
06/20/2018-1:45pmHouseThe Speaker designated the Honorable Mike Bost to act as Chairman of the Committee.
06/20/2018-1:45pmHouseHouse resolved itself into the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union pursuant to H. Res. 949 and Rule XVIII.
06/20/2018-1:45pmHouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 6, H.R. 5797 and H.R. 6082. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 6 and H.R.5797 under structured rules; and provides for consideration of H.R. 6082 under a closed rule. Additionally, the rule directs the Clerk to, in the engrossment of H.R. 6, add the text of H.R. 2851, H.R. 5735, and H.R. 5797 as passed by the House as a new matter at the end of H.R. 6.
06/20/2018-1:45pmHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 949. (consideration: CR H5335-5344; text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR H5338-5339)
06/19/2018-9:01pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 949 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 6, H.R. 5797 and H.R. 6082. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 6 and H.R.5797 under structured rules; and provides for consideration of H.R. 6082 under a closed rule. Additionally, the rule directs the Clerk to, in the engrossment of H.R. 6, add the text of H.R. 2851, H.R. 5735, and H.R. 5797 as passed by the House as a new matter at the end of H.R. 6.
06/12/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 558.
06/12/2018HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 115-723.
05/17/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
05/17/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
05/15/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
05/15/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Knight, Stephen [R-CA-25]* 05/15/2018
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 05/15/2018
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/17/2018
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/25/2018
Rep. Hill, J. French [R-AR-2] 06/12/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Energy and Commerce05/15/2018 Referred to
05/17/2018 Markup by
06/12/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-723
Senate Finance06/21/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.5797. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (06/20/2018)

Individuals in Medicaid Deserve Care that is Appropriate and Responsible in its Execution Act or the IMD CARE Act

(Sec. 2) This bill temporarily allows states to apply to receive federal Medicaid payment for services provided in institutions for mental diseases (IMDs) and for other medically necessary services for enrollees (aged 21 to 64) with opioid-use or cocaine-use disorders. Services may be covered for a total of up to 30 days in a 12-month period for an eligible enrollee. States must include specified information in their applications, including plans to improve access to outpatient care.

Current law generally prohibits federal payment under Medicaid for services provided in IMDs for individuals under the age of 65 (although states may receive payment through certain mechanisms, such as through a Medicaid demonstration waiver).

(Sec. 3) Additionally, the bill temporarily eliminates the enhanced federal matching rate for Medicaid expenditures regarding specified medical services provided by certain managed care organizations.