There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Post-Surgical Injections as an Opioid Alternative Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Post-Surgical Injections as an Opioid Alternative Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to provide for modifications in payment for certain outpatient surgical services.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
06/13/2018Committee on Ways and Means discharged.
06/13/2018Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 115-752, Part I.
05/15/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (9)

Date All Actions
06/13/2018Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 585.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/13/2018Committee on Ways and Means discharged.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/13/2018Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 115-752, Part I.
06/04/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
05/17/2018Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 36 - 14.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
05/17/2018Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
05/15/2018Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/15/2018Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/15/2018Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8]* 05/15/2018
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 05/15/2018
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/25/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Energy and Commerce05/15/2018 Referred to
05/17/2018 Markup by
06/13/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-752
House Ways and Means05/15/2018 Referred to
06/13/2018 Discharged from
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health06/04/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.5804. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House without amendment, Part I (06/13/2018)

Post-Surgical Injections as an Opioid Alternative Act

This bill temporarily freezes Medicare payment at 2016 levels for specified spinal surgery outpatient procedures that are conducted in ambulatory surgical centers.