There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Kari's Law Act of 2017

Other Short Titles

Kari's Law Act of 2017

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Kari's Law Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Kari's Law Act of 2017

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Kari's Law Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Communications Act of 1934 to require multi-line telephone systems to have a configuration that permits users to directly initiate a call to 9-1-1 without dialing any additional digit, code, prefix, or post-fix, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
02/16/2018Became Public Law No: 115-127. (TXT | PDF)
02/16/2018Signed by President.
02/09/2018Presented to President.
02/09/2018Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by voice vote.(text of Senate amendment: CR 2/8/2018 H992)
02/05/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
02/05/2018Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent.
01/23/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 408 - 0 (Roll no. 61).(text: CR H588)
01/17/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (24)

Date Chamber
02/16/2018Became Public Law No: 115-127. (TXT | PDF)
02/16/2018Signed by President.
02/09/2018HousePresented to President.
02/09/2018-5:34amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
02/09/2018-5:34amHouseOn motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by voice vote. (text of Senate amendment: CR 2/8/2018 H992)
02/08/2018-12:52pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Lance objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was considered as withdrawn.
02/08/2018-12:31pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on the Senate amendment to H.R. 582.
02/08/2018-12:30pmHouseMr. Lance moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H992-994)
02/08/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
02/05/2018SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
02/05/2018SenateS.Amdt.1921 Amendment SA 1921 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
02/05/2018SenateS.Amdt.1921 Amendment SA 1921 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Klobuchar. (consideration: CR S615; text: CR S615) To modify the effective date.
02/05/2018SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S615; text: CR S615)
02/05/2018SenateSenate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent.
01/24/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
01/23/2017-7:05pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
01/23/2017-7:05pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 408 - 0 (Roll no. 61). (text: CR H588)
01/23/2017-6:57pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H592)
01/23/2017-5:41pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
01/23/2017-5:26pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 582.
01/23/2017-5:26pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H588-590)
01/23/2017-5:26pmHouseMr. Lance moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
01/17/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
01/17/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce01/17/2017 Referred to
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation01/24/2017 Referred to
02/05/2018 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.582. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-127 (02/16/2018)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the Senate on February 5, 2018. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Kari's Law Act of 2017

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Communications Act of 1934 to prohibit businesses from manufacturing or importing for use in the United States, or selling or leasing in the United States, a multi-line telephone system unless it is pre-configured to allow users to directly initiate a call to 9-1-1 (without dialing any additional digit, code, prefix, or post-fix, including any trunk-access code such as the digit "9") from any station equipped with dialing facilities.

Businesses are prohibited from installing, managing, or operating multi-line telephone systems without such a direct 9-1-1 call configuration.

Businesses installing, managing, or operating such systems for use in the United States must configure the systems to provide a notification to a central location at the facility where the system is installed, or to another person or organization regardless of location, if the system is able to be so configured without an improvement to the hardware or software.