There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (9)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Foreign Investment Risk Review Modernization Act of 2018

Short Titles as Passed House for portions of this bill
  • Anti-Boycott Act of 2018
  • Export Control Reform Act of 2018
  • Export Controls Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

Foreign Investment Risk Review Modernization Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced for portions of this bill
  • Anti-Boycott Act of 2018
  • Export Control Reform Act of 2018
  • Export Controls Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To modernize and strengthen the Committee on Foreign Investment in the United States to more effectively guard against the risk to the national security of the United States posed by certain types of foreign investment, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
06/26/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 400 - 2 (Roll no. 295).(text: CR H5674-5690)
06/26/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-784, Part I.
05/16/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber All Actions
06/27/2018SenateReceived in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 492.
06/26/2018-4:02pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/26/2018-4:02pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 400 - 2 (Roll no. 295). (text: CR H5674-5690)
06/26/2018-3:54pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5705-5706)
06/26/2018-2:26pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
06/26/2018-1:42pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5841.
06/26/2018-1:42pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5674-5696)
06/26/2018-1:42pmHouseMr. Royce (CA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
06/26/2018HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-784, Part I.
05/22/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 53 - 0.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
05/22/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
05/18/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Digital Commerce and Consumer Protection.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
05/16/2018HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Energy and Commerce, Intelligence (Permanent Select), and Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
05/16/2018HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Energy and Commerce, Intelligence (Permanent Select), and Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
05/16/2018HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Energy and Commerce, Intelligence (Permanent Select), and Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
05/16/2018HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Energy and Commerce, Intelligence (Permanent Select), and Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
05/16/2018HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Energy and Commerce, Intelligence (Permanent Select), and Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
05/16/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 05/21/2018

Committees (5)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Foreign Affairs05/16/2018 Referred to
House Financial Services05/16/2018 Referred to
05/22/2018 Markup by
06/26/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-784
House Energy and Commerce05/16/2018 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Digital Commerce and Consumer Protection05/18/2018 Referred to
House Intelligence (Permanent Select)05/16/2018 Referred to
House Oversight and Government Reform05/16/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5841. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/16/2018)

Foreign Investment Risk Review Modernization Act of 2018

This bill amends the Defense Production Act of 1950 to revise the Committee on Foreign Investment in the United States' (CFIUS's) authority to review the national security implications of foreign investments. The definition of a "covered transaction" subject to CFIUS review is amended to include certain real estate transactions, sensitive transactions involving countries of special concern, and asset transfers pursuant to bankruptcy proceedings. Other topics revised by this bill include mitigation agreements, required CFIUS review factors, and CFIUS funding and resources.

The bill delays to 2021 the National Credit Union Administration rule titled "Risk-Based Capital" published on October 29, 2015.

Export Control Reform Act of 2018

Export Controls Act of 2018

The bill grants the President authority to control and regulate: (1) the export, reexport, and transfer of commodities, software, or technology; and (2) activities relating to specific nuclear, chemical, biological, or other weapons and related projects, and foreign intelligence services. The President must establish an interagency process to identify emerging technologies essential to national security.

Anti-Boycott Act of 2018

The President must issue regulations prohibiting specified actions with respect to foreign boycotts against a country friendly to the United States.

The President must impose sanctions regarding the export, the transfer, or efforts by a foreign country to use or acquire specified weapons technology.