There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Sanctity of Human Life Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide that human life shall be deemed to begin with fertilization.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/17/2017 Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
02/06/2017 Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
01/17/2017 Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/17/2017 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (36)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12]* 01/17/2017
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1]* 01/17/2017
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9]* 01/17/2017
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 01/17/2017
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 01/17/2017
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 01/17/2017
Rep. Ferguson, A. Drew, IV [R-GA-3]* 01/17/2017
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 01/17/2017
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14]* 01/17/2017
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6]* 01/17/2017
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 01/17/2017
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 01/17/2017
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 01/17/2017
Rep. Loudermilk, Barry [R-GA-11]* 01/17/2017
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 01/17/2017
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 01/17/2017
Rep. Russell, Steve [R-OK-5]* 01/17/2017
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 01/17/2017
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 01/17/2017
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7]* 01/17/2017
Rep. Brat, Dave [R-VA-7] 01/23/2017
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 01/23/2017
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 01/23/2017
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 01/31/2017
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 01/31/2017
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 02/09/2017
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/15/2017
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 02/15/2017
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/02/2017
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13] 05/22/2017
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/13/2017
Rep. Norman, Ralph [R-SC-5] 09/26/2017
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 10/10/2017
Rep. Garrett, Thomas A., Jr. [R-VA-5] 01/09/2018
Rep. Biggs, Andy [R-AZ-5] 01/30/2018
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2] 02/16/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary01/17/2017 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution and Civil Justice02/06/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (2)

  • Abortion

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.586. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/17/2017)

Sanctity of Human Life Act

This bill declares that: (1) the right to life guaranteed by the Constitution is vested in each human and is a person's most fundamental right; (2) each human life begins with fertilization, cloning, or its equivalent, at which time every human has all the legal and constitutional attributes and privileges of personhood; and (3) Congress, each state, the District of Columbia, and each U.S. territory have the authority to protect all human lives.