There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Maritime Border Security Review Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Maritime Border Security Review Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Maritime Border Security Review Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the Secretary of Homeland Security to conduct a maritime border threat analysis, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
09/04/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7796)
09/04/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-918.
05/17/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber All Actions
09/05/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
09/04/2018-5:46pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/04/2018-5:46pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7796)
09/04/2018-5:29pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5869.
09/04/2018-5:29pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR S7796-7799)
09/04/2018-5:29pmHouseMr. Katko moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/04/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 713.
09/04/2018HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-918.
07/24/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
07/24/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
07/24/2018HouseSubcommittee on Border and Maritime Security Discharged.
06/04/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
05/17/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
05/17/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (6)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Homeland Security05/17/2018 Referred to
07/24/2018 Markup by
09/04/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-918
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security06/04/2018 Referred to
07/24/2018 Discharged from
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs09/05/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.5869. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (09/04/2018)

Maritime Border Security Review Act

(Sec. 3) This bill directs the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to submit to Congress a maritime border (i.e., the transit zone and the borders and territorial waters of Puerto Rico and the U.S. Virgin Islands) threat analysis that includes an identification and description of:

  • current and potential terrorism and criminal threats posed by individuals and groups seeking to enter the United States through the maritime border or exploit border vulnerabilities on the maritime border;
  • improvements needed at U.S. seaports to prevent terrorists and instruments of terror from entering the United States and reduce criminal activity, as measured by the total flow of illegal goods and illicit drugs, related to the maritime border;
  • improvements needed with respect to the maritime border to prevent terrorists and instruments of terror from entering the United States and reduce criminal activity related to the maritime border;
  • vulnerabilities in law, policy, cooperation between state, territorial, and local law enforcement, or international agreements that hinder effective and efficient border security, counterterrorism, anti-human trafficking efforts, and the flow of legitimate trade relating to the maritime border; and
  • metrics and performance parameters used by DHS to evaluate maritime security effectiveness.

In preparing the threat analysis, DHS shall consider and examine:

  • technology and personnel needs and challenges;
  • the role of state, territorial, and local law enforcement in general border security activities;
  • the need for cooperation among federal, state, territorial, local, and appropriate international law enforcement entities relating to border security;
  • the geographic challenges of the maritime border; and
  • the impact and consequences of Hurricanes Harvey, Irma, Maria, and Nate on general border security activities relating to the maritime border.