There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Pittman-Robertson Wildlife Restoration Act and the Dingell-Johnson Federal Aid in Sport Fish Restoration Act, to provide parity for United States territories and the District of Columbia, to make technical corrections to such Acts and related laws, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
07/23/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6625-6626)
07/03/2018Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-802.
05/18/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
07/24/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
07/23/2018-5:22pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/23/2018-5:22pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6625-6626)
07/23/2018-5:16pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5875.
07/23/2018-5:16pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6625-6627)
07/23/2018-5:16pmHouseMr. McClintock moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
07/03/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 621.
07/03/2018HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-802.
06/06/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
06/06/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
06/06/2018HouseSubcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged.
05/22/2018HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands
05/18/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
05/18/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
05/18/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources05/18/2018 Referred to
06/06/2018 Markup by
07/03/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-802
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands05/18/2018 Referred to
05/22/2018 Hearings by
06/06/2018 Discharged from
Senate Environment and Public Works07/24/2018 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.5875.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5875. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/18/2018)

This bill requires the U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service to apportion certain wildlife-restoration funds to the U.S. territories and the District of Columbia in the same manner as such funds are apportioned under current law to the states.