There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Border Patrol Agent Pay Reform Amendments Act of 2018

Short Titles as Reported to House

Border Patrol Agent Pay Reform Amendments Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

Border Patrol Agent Pay Reform Amendments Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 5, United States Code, to modify the authority for pay and work schedules of border patrol agents, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
09/26/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H9078-9079)
09/25/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 115-973.
05/21/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber
09/27/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
09/26/2018-7:37pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/26/2018-7:37pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9078-9079)
09/26/2018-7:31pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5896.
09/26/2018-7:30pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9078-9080)
09/26/2018-7:30pmHouseMr. Russell moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/25/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 761.
09/25/2018HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 115-973.
05/23/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
05/23/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
05/21/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
05/21/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34]* 05/21/2018
Rep. McSally, Martha [R-AZ-2]* 05/21/2018
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 05/22/2018
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 06/12/2018
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1] 09/25/2018
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 09/25/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government05/21/2018 Referred to
05/23/2018 Markup by
09/25/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-973
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs09/27/2018 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.5896.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5896. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/21/2018)

Border Patrol Agent Pay Reform Amendments Act of 2018

This bill revises various elements of the compensation system for border patrol agents at U.S. Customs and Border Protection.

Among other things, the bill increases the overtime compensation available for border patrol agents who handle canines and limits the amount of overtime that is credited toward retirement for certain agents.