There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Walnut Grove Land Exchange Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Walnut Grove Land Exchange Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Walnut Grove Land Exchange Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Walnut Grove Land Exchange Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Walnut Grove Land Exchange Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of Agriculture to exchange certain public lands in Ouachita National Forest, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
12/21/2018Became Public Law No: 115-361. (TXT | PDF)
12/21/2018Signed by President.
12/21/2018Presented to President.
12/19/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/19/2018Senate Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7897)
09/12/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 379 - 3 (Roll no. 394).(text: CR H8129)
09/07/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-922.
05/22/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (23)

Date Chamber
12/21/2018Became Public Law No: 115-361. (TXT | PDF)
12/21/2018Signed by President.
12/21/2018HousePresented to President.
12/20/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/19/2018SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/19/2018SenateSenate Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7897)
09/17/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
09/12/2018-6:57pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/12/2018-6:57pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 379 - 3 (Roll no. 394). (text: CR H8129)
09/12/2018-6:31pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8157)
09/12/2018-4:00pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
09/12/2018-3:55pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5923.
09/12/2018-3:55pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8129-8130)
09/12/2018-3:55pmHouseMr. Gianforte moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/07/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 715.
09/07/2018HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-922.
07/18/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
07/18/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
07/18/2018HouseSubcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged.
07/17/2018HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands
06/05/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
05/22/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
05/22/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources05/22/2018 Referred to
07/18/2018 Markup by
09/07/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-922
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands06/05/2018 Referred to
07/17/2018 Hearings by
07/18/2018 Discharged from
Senate Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry09/17/2018 Referred to
12/19/2018 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5923. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-361 (12/21/2018)

Walnut Grove Land Exchange Act

(Sec. 3) This bill directs the the Department of Agriculture, if the Walnut Grove Church in Garland County, Arkansas, offers to convey to the United States approximately 6.3 acres of nonfederal land identified as Offered Tract 5742 in Ouachita National Forest, to

  • convey to the church approximately 4 acres identified as Selected Tract 5743 in the forest; and
  • accept in exchange, from the church, the conveyance of the Offered Tract.

The federal and nonfederal lands under the exchange shall be of equal value or the values shall be equalized by a cash payment, unless the value of the offered tract exceeds that of the selected tract.