There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Anti-Semitism Awareness Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for the consideration of a definition of anti-Semitism for the enforcement of Federal antidiscrimination laws concerning education programs or activities.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
05/23/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date All Actions
10/19/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Development.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
10/19/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
07/24/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
05/23/2018Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/23/2018Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/23/2018Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (50)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22]* 05/23/2018
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9]* 05/23/2018
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 05/23/2018
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 05/23/2018
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27]* 05/23/2018
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 05/23/2018
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17]* 05/23/2018
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 05/23/2018
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33]* 05/23/2018
Rep. Buck, Ken [R-CO-4]* 05/23/2018
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 05/23/2018
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 05/25/2018
Rep. Curbelo, Carlos [R-FL-26] 06/05/2018
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5] 06/05/2018
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 06/05/2018
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 06/05/2018
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1] 06/05/2018
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/05/2018
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6] 06/05/2018
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 06/08/2018
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 06/08/2018
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 06/08/2018
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 06/08/2018
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1] 06/08/2018
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 06/08/2018
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 06/08/2018
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-8] 06/08/2018
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 06/08/2018
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 06/08/2018
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/14/2018
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18] 06/14/2018
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/14/2018
Rep. Handel, Karen C. [R-GA-6] 06/14/2018
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 07/03/2018
Rep. Mitchell, Paul [R-MI-10] 07/03/2018
Rep. Ratcliffe, John [R-TX-4] 07/03/2018
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 07/06/2018
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 07/10/2018
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 07/11/2018
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 07/24/2018
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/24/2018
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 09/06/2018
Rep. Tenney, Claudia [R-NY-22] 09/17/2018
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 09/25/2018
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 09/25/2018
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 09/26/2018
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 10/23/2018
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/23/2018
Rep. Kustoff, David [R-TN-8] 11/16/2018
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 11/27/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary05/23/2018 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution and Civil Justice07/24/2018 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce05/23/2018 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education10/19/2018 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Development10/19/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5924. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/23/2018)

Anti-Semitism Awareness Act of 2018

This bill requires the Department of Education when reviewing whether there has been a violation of title VI of the Civil Rights Act of 1964 (prohibits discrimination on the basis of race, color, or national origin in programs and activities receiving federal financial assistance) based on an individual's actual or perceived shared Jewish ancestry or Jewish ethnic characteristics to consider the definition of "anti-Semitism" as part of its assessment of whether a practice was motivated by anti-Semitic intent.

For purposes of this bill, the definition of "anti-Semitism" is the definition set forth by the Special Envoy to Monitor and Combat Anti-Semitism of the Department of State in the Fact Sheet issued on June 8, 2010.