There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Northern Mariana Islands U.S. Workforce Act of 2018

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Northern Mariana Islands U.S. Workforce Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

Northern Mariana Islands U.S. Workforce Act of 2018

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Northern Mariana Islands U.S. Workforce Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To incentivize the hiring of United States workers in the Commonwealth of the Northern Mariana Islands, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (6)

Date Actions Overview
07/24/2018Became Public Law No: 115-218. (TXT | PDF)
07/24/2018Signed by President.
07/12/2018Presented to President.
06/28/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S4810; text: CR S4810-4811)
06/05/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H4745-4747)
05/24/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber All Actions
07/24/2018Became Public Law No: 115-218. (TXT | PDF)
07/24/2018Signed by President.
07/12/2018HousePresented to President.
06/29/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
06/28/2018SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S4810; text: CR S4810-4811)
06/06/2018SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
06/05/2018-4:43pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/05/2018-4:43pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4745-4747)
06/05/2018-4:34pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5956.
06/05/2018-4:34pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4745-4748)
06/05/2018-4:34pmHouseMr. Bishop (UT) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
05/24/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
05/24/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Del. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 05/24/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Natural Resources05/24/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5956. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-218 (07/24/2018)

Northern Mariana Islands U.S. Workforce Act of 2018

(Sec. 3) This bill extends by 10 years, through 2029, and revises the immigration transition program for the Commonwealth of the Northern Mariana Islands (CNMI).

The Governor of the CNMI must submit to the Department of Labor, and Labor must approve, a plan for using fees collected for vocational education.

Labor must report on the number of asylum seekers it anticipates at the end of the transition program and its efforts to prepare for the asylum seekers.

The bill revises the Commonwealth Only Transitional Worker permit system, including to limit the validity of a permit to a one-year period, at most.

Employers petitioning for one or more such permits must pay a specified fraud prevention and detection fee.

Before an employer's petition for a permit may be approved by Labor, the employer must apply to Labor for a temporary labor certification that confirms (1) there are not sufficient U.S. workers in the CNMI who are able, willing, qualified, and available to perform the work involved in the petition; and (2) employment of the nonimmigrant worker will not adversely affect the wages and working conditions of similarly employed U.S. workers. Workers under permits must be paid the highest of CNMI minimum wage, federal minimum wage, or the prevailing wage for the occupation. The bill provides for renewal of permits and three-year permits for workers permitted since FY2015.

The bill caps the number of permits that may be issued each fiscal year. The cap is lowered each year.