There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Mill Springs Battlefield National Monument Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Mill Springs Battlefield National Monument Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Mill Springs Battlefield National Monument Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Mill Springs Battlefield National Monument Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish the Mill Springs Battlefield National Monument in the State of Kentucky as a unit of the National Park System, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (4)

Date
11/26/2018Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-378.
07/23/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6627)
07/23/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-855.
05/25/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (19)

Date Chamber
11/26/2018SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 664.
11/26/2018SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-378.
10/02/2018SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
08/15/2018SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks
07/24/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
07/23/2018-5:31pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/23/2018-5:31pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6627)
07/23/2018-5:22pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5979.
07/23/2018-5:22pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6627-6628)
07/23/2018-5:22pmHouseMr. McClintock moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
07/23/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 662.
07/23/2018HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-855.
07/18/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
07/18/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
07/18/2018HouseSubcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged.
07/17/2018HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands
06/04/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
05/25/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
05/25/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources05/25/2018 Referred to
07/18/2018 Markup by
07/23/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-855
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands06/04/2018 Referred to
07/17/2018 Hearings by
07/18/2018 Discharged from
Senate Energy and Natural Resources07/24/2018 Referred to
10/02/2018 Markup by
11/26/2018 Reported by S. Rept. 115-378
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks08/15/2018 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5979. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/25/2018)

Mill Springs Battlefield National Monument Act

This bill establishes the Mill Springs Battlefield National Monument in Kentucky as a unit of the National Park System to preserve and interpret the nationally significant historic resources of the Mill Springs Battlefield and its role in the Civil War.

No private property or nonfederal public property shall be managed as a part of the monument without the owner's written consent.