Committees: H.R.5979 — 115th Congress (2017-2018)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Natural Resources05/25/2018 Referred to
07/18/2018 Markup by
07/23/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-855
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands06/04/2018 Referred to
07/17/2018 Hearings by
07/18/2018 Discharged from
Senate Energy and Natural Resources07/24/2018 Referred to
10/02/2018 Markup by
11/26/2018 Reported by S. Rept. 115-378
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks08/15/2018 Hearings by