There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Common Sense Certification Reform Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide relief for crane operators from third party certification in cases in which such operators are only delivering or retrieving propane containers.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/01/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
10/19/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Workforce Protections.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
06/01/2018Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/01/2018Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (50)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rooney, Francis [R-FL-19]* 06/01/2018
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7]* 06/01/2018
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/05/2018
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 06/05/2018
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 06/05/2018
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/05/2018
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 06/05/2018
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 06/07/2018
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12] 06/07/2018
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 06/07/2018
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 06/07/2018
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 06/07/2018
Rep. Gianforte, Greg [R-MT-At Large] 06/07/2018
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 06/08/2018
Rep. LaHood, Darin [R-IL-18] 06/12/2018
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 06/12/2018
Rep. Lesko, Debbie [R-AZ-8] 06/12/2018
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 06/13/2018
Rep. Loudermilk, Barry [R-GA-11] 06/14/2018
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10] 06/14/2018
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 06/15/2018
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 06/20/2018
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 06/20/2018
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 06/20/2018
Rep. Smucker, Lloyd [R-PA-16] 06/22/2018
Rep. Poliquin, Bruce [R-ME-2] 06/25/2018
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 06/25/2018
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-2] 06/25/2018
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 06/26/2018
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 06/27/2018
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 06/27/2018
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 07/03/2018
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4] 07/03/2018
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 07/11/2018
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 07/11/2018
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 07/11/2018
Rep. Mitchell, Paul [R-MI-10] 07/12/2018
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1] 07/12/2018
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 07/13/2018
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 07/17/2018
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 07/17/2018
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 07/19/2018
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 07/24/2018
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 07/24/2018
Rep. Davidson, Warren [R-OH-8] 07/25/2018
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8] 07/26/2018
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 07/26/2018
Rep. Bergman, Jack [R-MI-1] 07/26/2018
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 09/12/2018
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 09/12/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce06/01/2018 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Workforce Protections10/19/2018 Referred to

As of 12/15/2018 no related bill information has been received for H.R.5988 - Common Sense Certification Reform Act.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.