There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

READ Act
Reinforcing Education Accountability in Development Act

Short Titles as Introduced

READ Act
Reinforcing Education Accountability in Development Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

READ Act
Reinforcing Education Accountability in Development Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To enhance the transparency and accelerate the impact of assistance provided under the Foreign Assistance Act of 1961 to promote quality basic education in developing countries, to better enable such countries to achieve universal access to quality basic education and improved learning outcomes, to eliminate duplication and waste, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
06/05/2017 Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker with amendments. Without written report.
01/24/2017 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text of measure as passed: CR H662-664)
01/23/2017 Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date Chamber
06/05/2017 Senate Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 116.
06/05/2017 Senate Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker with amendments. Without written report.
Action By: Senate Foreign Relations
05/25/2017 Senate Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
Action By: Senate Foreign Relations
01/30/2017 Senate Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
01/24/2017-5:10pm House Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
01/24/2017-5:10pm House On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text of measure as passed: CR H662-664)
01/24/2017-4:52pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 601.
01/24/2017-4:52pm House Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H662-666)
01/24/2017-4:52pm House Mr. Royce (CA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
01/23/2017 House Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
01/23/2017 House Introduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs01/23/2017 Referred to
Senate Foreign Relations01/30/2017 Referred to
05/25/2017 Markup by
06/05/2017 Reported by

Related Bills (1)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.

Subjects (14)

  • Academic performance and assessments
  • Adult education and literacy
  • Conflicts and wars
  • Congressional oversight
  • Elementary and secondary education
  • Executive agency funding and structure
  • Federal officials
  • Foreign aid and international relief
  • Multilateral development programs
  • School administration
  • Teaching, teachers, curricula
  • U.S. Agency for International Development (USAID)
  • Women's education

Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.601. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (01/24/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary has been expanded because action occurred on the measure.)

Reinforcing Education Accountability in Development Act or the READ Act

(Sec. 3) This bill amends the Foreign Assistance Act of 1961 to state that it shall be U.S. policy to work with partner countries, other donors, multilateral institutions, the private sector, and nongovernmental and civil society organizations (including faith-based organizations) to promote basic education through programs that: (1) respond to the needs and capacities of developing countries to improve literacy and other basic skills; (2) strengthen educational systems, expand access to safe learning environments (including by breaking down barriers to basic education for women and girls), and support the engagement of parents in their children's education; (3) promote education as a foundation for economic growth; and (4) monitor and evaluate the effectiveness and quality of basic education programs in partner countries.

(Sec. 4) The President shall: (1) seek to improve the effectiveness of assistance by coordinating relevant executive branch efforts, (2) ensure that assistance is aligned with U.S. foreign policy and economic interests, and (3) submit to Congress by October 1, 2017, a comprehensive FY2018 through FY2022 strategy to promote basic education in partner countries.

(Sec. 5) The bill establishes within the U.S. Agency for International Development the position of Senior Coordinator of United States International Basic Education Assistance, who shall have primary responsibility for the oversight and coordination of U.S. government resources and activities relating to the promotion of international basic education.

(Sec. 6) The President shall ensure that programs carried out under the comprehensive strategy: (1) apply monitoring and evaluation methodologies to determine if programs and activities accomplish measurable improvements in literacy, numeracy, or other basic skills development; and (2) include funding for both short- and long-term monitoring and evaluation.

(Sec. 7) The President shall submit to Congress an annual implementation report.