There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Migratory Bird Framework and Hunting Opportunities for Veterans Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To amend the Migratory Bird Treaty Act to establish January 31 of each year as the Federal framework closing date for the duck hunting season and to establish special duck hunting days for youths, veterans, and active military personnel, and for other purposes.

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Migratory Bird Treaty Act to establish January 31 of each year as the Federal closing date for duck hunting season and to establish special duck hunting days for youths, veterans, and active military personnel, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
09/25/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8853-8854)
09/25/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-969.
06/06/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
09/26/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
09/25/2018-8:52pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
09/25/2018-8:52pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/25/2018-8:52pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8853-8854)
09/25/2018-8:49pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6013.
09/25/2018-8:49pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8853-8854)
09/25/2018-8:49pmHouseMr. McClintock moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/25/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 757.
09/25/2018HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-969.
09/05/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
09/05/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
09/05/2018HouseSubcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged.
07/17/2018HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands
06/11/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
06/06/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
06/06/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bergman, Jack [R-MI-1]* 06/06/2018
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1] 07/17/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources06/06/2018 Referred to
09/05/2018 Markup by
09/25/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-969
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands06/11/2018 Referred to
07/17/2018 Hearings by
09/05/2018 Discharged from
Senate Environment and Public Works09/26/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.6013. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (09/25/2018)

Migratory Bird Framework and Hunting Opportunities for Veterans Act

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Migratory Bird Treaty Act to revise requirements for hunting ducks, mergansers, and coots. Specifically, the bill establishes January 31 of each year as the closing date of the hunting season for ducks, mergansers, and coots. In addition, states may extend the hunting season for those birds by an extra weekend for youths, veterans, and members of the Armed Forces on active duty.