There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To reauthorize the Family Violence Prevention and Services Act.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
09/28/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.(text: CR H9359)
09/28/2018Committee on Education and the Workforce discharged.
06/06/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date Chamber
10/19/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
10/01/2018SenateReceived in the Senate.
09/28/2018-12:30pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/28/2018-12:30pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H9359)
09/28/2018-12:30pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H9359)
09/28/2018-12:29pmHouseMr. Thompson (PA) asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
09/28/2018HouseCommittee on Education and the Workforce discharged.
06/06/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
06/06/2018HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H4983-4984)
06/06/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (103)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 06/06/2018
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21]* 06/06/2018
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large]* 06/06/2018
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 06/07/2018
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 06/07/2018
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 06/13/2018
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/13/2018
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10] 06/13/2018
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 06/13/2018
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 06/13/2018
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/13/2018
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/13/2018
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/13/2018
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/13/2018
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 06/13/2018
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 06/13/2018
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 06/13/2018
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 06/13/2018
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 06/13/2018
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 06/13/2018
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/13/2018
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 06/13/2018
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 06/13/2018
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 06/13/2018
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/13/2018
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 06/13/2018
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 06/14/2018
Rep. Young, David [R-IA-3] 06/14/2018
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 06/21/2018
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 06/22/2018
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 06/25/2018
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 06/25/2018
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/25/2018
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6] 06/26/2018
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 06/26/2018
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 06/26/2018
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-8] 06/27/2018
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/27/2018
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 06/27/2018
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 06/27/2018
Rep. Smucker, Lloyd [R-PA-16] 06/27/2018
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 06/27/2018
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/27/2018
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 06/28/2018
Rep. Walters, Mimi [R-CA-45] 06/28/2018
Rep. Mitchell, Paul [R-MI-10] 06/28/2018
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 06/28/2018
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/28/2018
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 06/28/2018
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10] 06/28/2018
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5] 07/10/2018
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/10/2018
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 07/10/2018
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12] 07/10/2018
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 07/10/2018
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 07/10/2018
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 07/10/2018
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/10/2018
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/10/2018
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 07/10/2018
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/10/2018
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 07/10/2018
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/10/2018
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 07/11/2018
Rep. MacArthur, Thomas [R-NJ-3] 07/12/2018
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 07/12/2018
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 07/13/2018
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 07/16/2018
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 07/16/2018
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 07/16/2018
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 07/16/2018
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4] 07/16/2018
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4] 07/16/2018
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 07/16/2018
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7] 07/16/2018
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 07/16/2018
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 07/16/2018
Rep. Trott, David A. [R-MI-11] 07/17/2018
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12] 07/17/2018
Rep. Faso, John J. [R-NY-19] 07/17/2018
Rep. Donovan, Daniel M., Jr. [R-NY-11] 07/17/2018
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 07/17/2018
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 07/17/2018
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5] 07/17/2018
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1] 07/18/2018
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 07/18/2018
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/18/2018
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 07/18/2018
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 07/18/2018
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 07/18/2018
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 07/18/2018
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 07/19/2018
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 07/23/2018
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 07/23/2018
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/26/2018
Rep. Curbelo, Carlos [R-FL-26] 07/26/2018
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 07/26/2018
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 08/21/2018
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 08/31/2018
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 08/31/2018
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 08/31/2018
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 09/04/2018
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 09/12/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce06/06/2018 Referred to
09/28/2018 Discharged from
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education10/19/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.6014. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (09/28/2018)

(Sec. 1) This bill reauthorizes the Family Violence Prevention and Services Act through FY2023. The Act provides services and support for victims of family violence, domestic violence, or dating violence.