There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Bus Operator and Pedestrian Protection Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 49, United States Code, to require the development of a bus operations safety risk reduction program, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
06/06/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
06/07/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
06/06/2018Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/06/2018Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (78)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24]* 06/06/2018
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 06/06/2018
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/06/2018
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 06/06/2018
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 06/06/2018
Rep. Donovan, Daniel M., Jr. [R-NY-11] 06/07/2018
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 06/07/2018
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/07/2018
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 06/07/2018
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/13/2018
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 06/13/2018
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 06/14/2018
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 06/14/2018
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5] 06/20/2018
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 06/25/2018
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/25/2018
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 06/25/2018
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 06/29/2018
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 06/29/2018
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 07/03/2018
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 07/03/2018
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 07/10/2018
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/10/2018
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 07/10/2018
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 07/11/2018
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 07/11/2018
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 07/11/2018
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 07/11/2018
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 07/12/2018
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 07/12/2018
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/16/2018
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 07/16/2018
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/16/2018
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/17/2018
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 07/17/2018
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 07/23/2018
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 07/24/2018
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 07/24/2018
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/25/2018
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 07/25/2018
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/26/2018
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/31/2018
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 08/03/2018
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 08/10/2018
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 08/14/2018
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5] 08/21/2018
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 08/24/2018
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 09/12/2018
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21] 09/17/2018
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 09/25/2018
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 09/26/2018
Rep. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV-3] 09/28/2018
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/02/2018
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 10/05/2018
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 10/05/2018
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 10/05/2018
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 10/05/2018
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 10/09/2018
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 10/09/2018
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 10/19/2018
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 10/23/2018
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 10/23/2018
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/26/2018
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 10/30/2018
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 11/02/2018
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 11/16/2018
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4] 11/20/2018
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 11/27/2018
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 11/27/2018
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 11/29/2018
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 12/06/2018
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 12/06/2018
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 12/06/2018
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 12/10/2018
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 12/10/2018
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 12/10/2018
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 12/12/2018
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 12/20/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure06/06/2018 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Highways and Transit06/07/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6016. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/06/2018)

Bus Operator and Pedestrian Protection Act

This bill requires the Department of Transportation (DOT) to require public transportation safety grant recipients that operate fixed route bus service to: (1) develop a risk reduction program for bus operations to improve safety by reducing the number and rates of accidents, injuries, assaults on bus operators, and fatalities; (2) submit the program, including the implementation plan required by this bill, to DOT for review and approval; and (3) implement the program and plans approved by DOT.

The recipient of a public transportation safety grant shall report to DOT, for inclusion in the National Transit Database, any information on each assault on an public transportation vehicle operator.