There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

PRINT Act
Protecting Rational Incentives in Newsprint Trade Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require a study of the well-being of the newsprint and publishing industry in the United States, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/07/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
06/12/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
06/07/2018Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/07/2018Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/07/2018Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (38)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13]* 06/07/2018
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 06/07/2018
Rep. Norman, Ralph [R-SC-5]* 06/07/2018
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 06/07/2018
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14]* 06/07/2018
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 06/07/2018
Rep. Poliquin, Bruce [R-ME-2]* 06/07/2018
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12]* 06/07/2018
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6]* 06/07/2018
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13]* 06/07/2018
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8]* 06/07/2018
Rep. Cheney, Liz [R-WY-At Large] 06/19/2018
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 06/19/2018
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 06/19/2018
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 06/19/2018
Rep. Trott, David A. [R-MI-11] 06/20/2018
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 06/20/2018
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 06/22/2018
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/22/2018
Rep. Young, David [R-IA-3] 06/25/2018
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 06/25/2018
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1] 06/25/2018
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/25/2018
Rep. Knight, Stephen [R-CA-25] 06/25/2018
Rep. McSally, Martha [R-AZ-2] 07/10/2018
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 07/10/2018
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 07/13/2018
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4] 07/16/2018
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 07/16/2018
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/19/2018
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5] 07/19/2018
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 07/19/2018
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 07/25/2018
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 07/25/2018
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 07/25/2018
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 07/25/2018
Rep. Faso, John J. [R-NY-19] 07/31/2018
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 07/31/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means06/07/2018 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Trade06/12/2018 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce06/07/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6031. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/07/2018)

Protecting Rational Incentives in Newsprint Trade Act of 2018 or the PRINT Act

This bill directs the Department of Commerce to conduct a study of, and to report to Congress regarding, the economic well-being, health, and vitality of the newsprint industry and the local newspaper publishing industry in the United States, including an assessment of:

  • the trends in demand for newsprint and traditional printed newspapers, in demand for digital or online consumption of news, and in the U.S. pulp and paper industry and the effect of declining demand for newsprint on the health of such industry;
  • measures undertaken by printers and newspaper publishers to reduce costs in response to increased costs for newsprint in the United States, and whether such measures have harmed local news coverage or reduced employment in the newspaper and publishing industries;
  • whether measures undertaken by publishers and printers to reduce costs have harmed local businesses that advertise in local newspapers; and
  • the global production capacity for newsprint in light of the declining demand for newsprint.

Commerce and the U.S. International Trade Commission may not give effect to an affirmative determination in an antidumping or countervailing duty investigation relating to imports of uncoated groundwood paper until the President certifies that he has received the report and has concluded that giving effect to the determination is in the economic interest of the United States.

Until such time as the President issues the certification, the administering authority shall order a rate of zero for deposits posted in such an investigation.