There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

SMART IoT Act
State of Modern Application, Research, and Trends of IoT Act

Short Titles as Introduced

SMART IoT Act
State of Modern Application, Research, and Trends of IoT Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of Commerce to conduct a study and submit to Congress a report on the state of the internet-connected devices industry in the United States.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
11/28/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H9675)
11/02/2018Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 115-1003.
06/07/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber
11/29/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
11/28/2018-5:01pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/28/2018-5:01pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9675)
11/28/2018-4:52pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6032.
11/28/2018-4:52pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9675-9676)
11/28/2018-4:51pmHouseMr. Latta moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
11/02/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 784.
11/02/2018HouseReported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 115-1003.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
07/12/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
07/12/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
06/13/2018HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Commerce Subcommittee on Digital Commerce and Consumer Protection
06/08/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Digital Commerce and Consumer Protection.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
06/07/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
06/07/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce06/07/2018 Referred to
07/12/2018 Markup by
11/02/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-1003
House Commerce Subcommittee on Digital Commerce and Consumer Protection06/08/2018 Referred to
06/13/2018 Reported by
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation11/29/2018 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.6032.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.6032. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House without amendment (11/02/2018)

State of Modern Application, Research, and Trends of IoT Act or the SMART IoT Act

This bill directs the Department of Commerce to conduct a study on the state of the Internet-connected devices industry (commonly known as the Internet of Things) in the United States.