Text: H.R.6042 — 115th Congress (2017-2018)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-222 (07/30/2018)

 
[115th Congress Public Law 222]
[From the U.S. Government Publishing Office]



[[Page 132 STAT. 1560]]

Public Law 115-222
115th Congress

                                 An Act


 
To amend title XIX of the Social Security Act to delay the reduction in 
    Federal medical assistance percentage for Medicaid personal care 
services furnished without an electronic visit verification system, and 
       for other purposes. <<NOTE: July 30, 2018 -  [H.R. 6042]>> 

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled,
SECTION 1. DELAY IN REDUCTION OF FMAP FOR MEDICAID PERSONAL CARE 
                              SERVICES FURNISHED WITHOUT AN 
                              ELECTRONIC VISIT VERIFICATION 
                              SYSTEM.

    (a) In General.--Section 1903(l) of the Social Security Act (42 
U.S.C. 1396b(l)) is amended--
            (1) in paragraph (1)--
                    (A) by striking ``January 1, 2019'' and inserting 
                ``January 1, 2020''; and
                    (B) in subparagraph (A)(i), by striking ``2019 
                and''; and
            (2) in paragraph (4)(A)(i), by striking ``calendar quarters 
        in 2019'' and inserting ``calendar quarters in 2020''.

    (b) Sense of Congress on Stakeholder Input Regarding Electronic 
Visit Verification Systems.--It is the sense of Congress that--
            (1) the Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services should--
                    (A) convene at least one public meeting in 2018 for 
                the purpose of soliciting ongoing feedback from Medicaid 
                stakeholders on guidance issued by the Centers for 
                Medicare & Medicaid Services on May 16, 2018, regarding 
                electronic visit verification; and
                    (B) communicate with such stakeholders regularly and 
                throughout the implementation process in a clear and 
                transparent manner to monitor beneficiary protections;
            (2) such stakeholders should include State Medicaid 
        directors, beneficiaries, family caregivers, individuals and 
        entities who provide personal care services or home health care 
        services, Medicaid managed care organizations, electronic visit 
        verification vendors, and other stakeholders, as determined by 
        the Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services; and

[[Page 132 STAT. 1561]]

            (3) taking into account stakeholder input on the 
        implementation of the electronic visit verification requirement 
        under the Medicaid program is vital in order to ensure that the 
        Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services is aware and able to 
        mitigate any adverse outcomes with the implementation of this 
        policy.

    Approved July 30, 2018.

LEGISLATIVE HISTORY--H.R. 6042:
---------------------------------------------------------------------------

CONGRESSIONAL RECORD, Vol. 164 (2018):
            June 19, considered and passed House.
            July 17, considered and passed Senate.

                                  <all>