There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to improve the productivity of the management of Department of Veterans Affairs health care, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
11/16/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-1034.
06/08/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date All Actions
11/16/2018Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 807.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/16/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-1034.
07/12/2018Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
07/12/2018Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
06/27/2018Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health
06/27/2018Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health
06/13/2018Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health
06/13/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
06/08/2018Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/08/2018Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Veterans' Affairs06/08/2018 Referred to
07/12/2018 Markup by
11/16/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-1034
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health06/13/2018 Referred to
06/13/2018 Hearings by
06/27/2018 Markup by
06/27/2018 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6066. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/08/2018)

This bill directs the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to:

  • track VA provider workloads considering the time, mental effort and judgment, technical skill, physical effort, and stress involved in delivering a procedure;
  • require VA providers to attend training on clinical procedure coding; and
  • establish standardized performance standards for each VA facility in order to evaluate clinical productivity at the provider and facility levels.