There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Transporting Livestock Across America Safely Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the Secretary of Transportation to modify provisions relating to hours of service requirements with respect to transportation of certain live animals, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/12/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
06/13/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
06/12/2018Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/12/2018Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (64)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 06/12/2018
Rep. Young, David [R-IA-3]* 06/12/2018
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 06/12/2018
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16]* 06/12/2018
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1]* 06/12/2018
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 06/12/2018
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-11]* 06/12/2018
Rep. Estes, Ron [R-KS-4]* 06/12/2018
Rep. Dunn, Neal P. [R-FL-2]* 06/12/2018
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17]* 06/12/2018
Rep. Gianforte, Greg [R-MT-At Large]* 06/12/2018
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large]* 06/12/2018
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14]* 06/12/2018
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 06/12/2018
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3]* 06/12/2018
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8]* 06/12/2018
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 06/12/2018
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 06/12/2018
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7]* 06/12/2018
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9]* 06/12/2018
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 06/12/2018
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2]* 06/12/2018
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7]* 06/12/2018
Rep. Higgins, Clay [R-LA-3]* 06/12/2018
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 06/12/2018
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 06/12/2018
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 06/12/2018
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 06/12/2018
Rep. Curtis, John R. [R-UT-3]* 06/12/2018
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 06/12/2018
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 06/12/2018
Rep. Arrington, Jodey C. [R-TX-19]* 06/12/2018
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8]* 06/12/2018
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8]* 06/12/2018
Rep. Banks, Jim [R-IN-3]* 06/12/2018
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 06/12/2018
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 06/12/2018
Rep. Johnson, Mike [R-LA-4]* 06/12/2018
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4]* 06/12/2018
Rep. Comer, James [R-KY-1]* 06/12/2018
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5]* 06/12/2018
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6]* 06/12/2018
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 06/12/2018
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 06/12/2018
Rep. Davidson, Warren [R-OH-8]* 06/12/2018
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 06/13/2018
Rep. Cheney, Liz [R-WY-At Large] 06/13/2018
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 06/13/2018
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 06/14/2018
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 06/15/2018
Rep. Ratcliffe, John [R-TX-4] 06/19/2018
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/19/2018
Rep. Buck, Ken [R-CO-4] 06/20/2018
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 07/03/2018
Rep. Faso, John J. [R-NY-19] 07/16/2018
Rep. Walker, Mark [R-NC-6] 07/23/2018
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 08/03/2018
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8] 09/04/2018
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 09/04/2018
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 09/05/2018
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 09/12/2018
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 09/25/2018
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 09/25/2018
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1] 09/25/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure06/12/2018 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Highways and Transit06/13/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6079. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/12/2018)

Transporting Livestock Across America Safely Act

This bill requires the Department of Transportation to amend regulations on hours of service for commercial drivers who transport live covered animals (i.e., livestock, honey bees, insects, fish, and crawfish) within a 300 air-mile radius from where the on-duty time of the driver begins. The regulations must: (1) exclude from the driver's on-duty time certain activities, such as loading or unloading a commercial motor vehicle; (2) change the driving time requirement to a maximum of not less than 15, and not more than 18, hours within a 24-hour period; (3) permit the driver to take one or more rest periods during the trip, which shall not be included in the calculation of the driving time; (4) require the driver, after completion of the trip, to take a rest break for a period that is five hours less than the maximum driving time; (5) exclude from the calculation of the driving time up to two additional hours, if the driver is within 150 air-miles of the point of delivery; and (6) make inapplicable the requirement that the driver take a 10-hour rest period before driving.