There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Workers' Freedom to Negotiate Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the National Labor Relations Act, the Labor Management Relations Act, 1947, the Labor-Management Reporting and Disclosure Act, 1959, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
06/13/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date All Actions
10/19/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Workforce Protections.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
10/19/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
06/13/2018Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/13/2018Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/13/2018Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (79)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 06/13/2018
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 06/13/2018
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 06/13/2018
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 06/13/2018
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 06/13/2018
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 06/13/2018
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 06/13/2018
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13]* 06/13/2018
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 06/13/2018
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11]* 06/13/2018
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 06/13/2018
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/13/2018
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/13/2018
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 06/13/2018
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 06/13/2018
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 06/13/2018
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1]* 06/13/2018
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 06/13/2018
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 06/13/2018
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 06/13/2018
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 06/13/2018
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 06/13/2018
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 06/13/2018
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 06/13/2018
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 06/13/2018
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 06/13/2018
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 06/13/2018
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 06/13/2018
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen [D-HI-1]* 06/13/2018
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 06/13/2018
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 06/13/2018
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12]* 06/13/2018
Rep. Lamb, Conor [D-PA-18]* 06/13/2018
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 06/13/2018
Rep. Kihuen, Ruben J. [D-NV-4] 06/14/2018
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 06/14/2018
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/14/2018
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 06/14/2018
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 06/14/2018
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 06/14/2018
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12] 06/14/2018
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 06/14/2018
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/14/2018
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 06/14/2018
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 06/19/2018
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 06/19/2018
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 06/19/2018
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/22/2018
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 07/10/2018
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 07/10/2018
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 07/10/2018
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/10/2018
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 07/17/2018
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 07/17/2018
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 07/17/2018
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 07/23/2018
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/25/2018
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 08/07/2018
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 08/17/2018
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 08/17/2018
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 08/17/2018
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 08/17/2018
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 08/17/2018
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 08/17/2018
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 08/24/2018
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/05/2018
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 09/12/2018
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 09/20/2018
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 09/20/2018
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 09/20/2018
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/25/2018
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/25/2018
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/27/2018
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 10/23/2018
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 10/26/2018
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 11/06/2018
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 11/06/2018
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 11/06/2018
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-15] 12/20/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce06/13/2018 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions10/19/2018 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Workforce Protections10/19/2018 Referred to
House Oversight and Government Reform06/13/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6080. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/13/2018)

Workers' Freedom to Negotiate Act of 2018

This bill amends the National Labor Relations Act (NRLA) and related labor laws to extend protections to union workers. Specifically, it:

  • revises the definition of "employee" and "supervisor" to prevent employers from removing employees from the protections of the labor laws,
  • prohibits employers from interfering with certain rights granted to employees under the NLRA,
  • expands unfair labor practices to include prohibitions against replacement of worker who strike or discrimination against them,
  • imposes new penalties against employers who violate labor law requirements,
  • allows workers to bring civil actions against employers for labor law violations and unfair labor practices,
  • requires certain disclosures with respect to worker wages, and
  • requires contractors seeking federal contracts over $500,000 to disclose labor law violations when applying for such contracts.