There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Improving Social Security's Service to Victims of Identity Theft Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Improving Social Security's Service to Victims of Identity Theft Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Improving Social Security's Service to Victims of Identity Theft Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title VII of the Social Security Act to provide for a single point of contact at the Social Security Administration for individuals who are victims of identity theft.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
07/24/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7113)
06/29/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 115-800.
06/13/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber All Actions
07/25/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
07/24/2018-3:32pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/24/2018-3:32pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7113)
07/24/2018-3:23pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6084.
07/24/2018-3:23pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7113-7115)
07/24/2018-3:22pmHouseMr. Bishop (MI) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
06/29/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 619.
06/29/2018HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 115-800.
06/21/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
06/21/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
06/20/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Social Security.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
06/13/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
06/13/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (10)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Ways and Means06/13/2018 Referred to
06/21/2018 Markup by
06/29/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-800
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Social Security06/20/2018 Referred to
Senate Finance07/25/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.6084. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (07/24/2018)


Improving Social Security's Service to Victims of Identity Theft Act

(Sec. 2) This bill requires the Social Security Administration to provide a single point of contact for any individual whose Social Security account number has been misused. The single point of contact must track the individual's case to completion and coordinate with other specialized units to resolve case issues as quickly as possible.